open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:9:19-bk-01117-
    Party Name:Kelli Jean Wolin
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tardif, Robert E [Notice Fixing Time to File Proofs of Claim - 90/75/other days]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tardif, Robert E [(NO PAPER) - Notice Of Assets]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tardif, Robert E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:June 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tardif, Robert E [Discharge Of Debtor - Ch. 7 - TAMPA/ORLANDO/JAX]
    Date Published:June 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tardif, Robert E [Electronic Service Text Entry (TEXT ONLY)]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tardif, Robert E [Order on Application to Employ/Retain (BK)]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tardif, Robert E [Application to Employ/Retain]
    Date Published:April 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tardif, Robert E [(NO PAPER) - Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
    Date Published:March 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tardif, Robert E [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tardif, Robert E [(NO PAPER) - 521 Compliance Entry]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tardif, Robert E [341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 7 Indiv. No Asset]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - Case Upload]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (case upload)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Numbers (case upload)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.flmb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1276049
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =