open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:19-11872-
    Party Name:Steven Lew Saltzman and Fern Robyn Saltzman
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Furr, Robert C [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Furr, Robert C [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:May 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Furr, Robert C [Auto Discharge of Debtor(s) [Ch 7]]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Furr, Robert C [Certificate of Service [Attorney]]
    Date Published:April 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Furr, Robert C [Approve Order]
    Date Published:March 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Furr, Robert C [Stipulation Order]
    Date Published:March 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Furr, Robert C [Approve]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Furr, Robert C [Stipulation]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Furr, Robert C [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Furr, Robert C [Certification of Financial Management Course (ADI)]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Furr, Robert C [Order Re: Debtor's Compliance with 521(a)(1) Filing Requirements]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Furr, Robert C [Trustee's Statement Re: Debtor's Compliance with 521(a)(1) Filing Requirements [PAPERLESS]]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Furr, Robert C [Ch 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Furr, Robert C [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Furr, Robert C [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Furr, Robert C [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset) [Auto]]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Furr, Robert C [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Furr, Robert C [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Furr, Robert C [Disclosure of Compensation]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Furr, Robert C [Chapter 7 Statement of Your Monthly Income Form 122A-1 [Ch 7]]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Furr, Robert C [Certification of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statement of Your Monthly Income Form 122A-1 [Ch 7]]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 [Certification of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Furr, Robert C [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Furr, Robert C [Voluntary Petition Ch 7 [ECF]]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 9 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition Ch 7 [ECF]]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.flsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?744331
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =