Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Florida
    Case Number:19-13325-
    Party Name:Enrique Alberto Garcia
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tabas, Joel L [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tabas, Joel L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:March 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tabas, Joel L [Order Dismissing Case (Deficiencies)]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tabas, Joel L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tabas, Joel L [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tabas, Joel L [Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee Order]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tabas, Joel L [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Tabas, Joel L [Notice of Pro Bono Resources]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.flsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?745815
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =