open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:8:19-cr-00222-1
    Party Name:USA v. Dorelien
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on motion to continue trial]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Trial]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Trial calendar]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Report]
    Date Published:June 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney ]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial discovery order]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Hearing]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Bond]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on motion to appoint counsel]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.flmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?363911
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =