open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Florida

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Middle District of Florida
    Case Number:8:19-cv-01174
    Party Name:Taylor Media Corp v. Fluent, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case management and scheduling order]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Report]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Strike]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on motion to dismiss]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of hearing on motion]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for oral argument]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:June 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:June 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons returned executed]
    Date Published:June 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement]
    Date Published:June 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of pendency of related cases]
    Date Published:June 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of appearance]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [File Excess Pages]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Related case order and track 2 notice]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Copyright Report]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons issued]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.flmd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?363892
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =