open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia
    Case Number:13-75377-pmb
    Party Name:Albert Alphonso King
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Closing Estate]
    Date Published:December 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [06-Close Bankruptcy Case - Dismissed]
    Date Published:December 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Order Closing 13 Dismissed]
    Date Published:December 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Trustees (12/13) Final Report (batch)]
    Date Published:December 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Dismissing Case.]
    Date Published:November 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [07-Order Dismissing Ch. 13 Case - MTD Hearing Held/Funding]
    Date Published:October 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Goodman, Adam M. [Retain Funds, Motion to]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.ganb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?984971
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =