open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia
    Case Number:19-41154-bem
    Party Name:American Berber, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order (492)]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [P-Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [P-Amended List of Creditors (FEE)]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [01-Order]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Continuation of Utility Service, Motion for]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Substantively Consolidate, Motion to]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Incur Debt]
    Date Published:July 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Incur Debt, Motion to]
    Date Published:July 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Incur Debt Other Than Under 364(b), Motion to]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Application to Employ (408)]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [P-Attorney Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Application to Employ]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order and Notice Setting Last Day to File Claims]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [07-Application to Employ]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [P-Equity Security Holders]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [P-Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [P-Schedule H]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [P-Schedule G]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [P-Schedule E/F]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [P-Schedule D]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [P-Schedule A/B]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [P-Declaration of Debtor]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [P-Amendment to Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Extend Time (406)]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time, Motion to]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Pay Pre-Petition Claims (453)]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [06-Motion to Extend Time]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Miscellaneous Deficiencies]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Leave of Absence]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:May 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Deadlines to Correct New Case Deficiency - Non-Individual]
    Date Published:May 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order and Notice]
    Date Published:May 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [0-Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order and Notice]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [03-Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 11)]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order Setting Deadlines for Debtor to Correct Filing Deficiencies (Non-Individual)]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Set Hearing, Motion to]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Pay Pre-Petition Claims, Motion to]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Autodocket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ganb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1162332
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =