open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:06-60038
    Party Name:Marjorie Ann Mobley
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Contempt]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [Reopen Case]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Hearing Set]
    Date Published:July 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Response With Opposition]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Generic Motion ]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Reopen Case]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.gamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?250576
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =