open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia
    Case Number:19-59163-pmb
    Party Name:Marcus Lenell Jones and Chikita Diane Jones
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Notice to Debtor Regarding Financial Management Certificate Due]
    Date Published:September 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Notice of Hearing on Confirmation of Modified Plan and of Deadlines for Objections]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan (batch)]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:June 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:June 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Employer Deduction Order]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Autodocket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Employer Deduction Order]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [02-Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 13) and Confirmation Hearing]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Statement of SSN/ITIN (B121) (**Do NOT select this event with other events**)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [01 - Chapter 13 Plan - Initial Plan]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Credit Counseling Service Certificate]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ganb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1164432
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =