open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:19-70687
    Party Name:Tonya Lashawn Anderson
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Hearing Held-Plan Confirmed (Terminate Hearings)]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Final Installment Payment/Filing Fee Paid in Full]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:June 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Payroll Deduction]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Installment Payment]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.gamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?386681
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =