open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia
    Case Number:19-41602-bem
    Party Name:Arion D. Pickett
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice to Debtor Re: Financial Mgmt. Cert.]
    Date Published:September 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Notice to Debtor Regarding Financial Management Certificate Due]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Notice of Deficiency - Filing Fee (60 day)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Objection to Confirmation of Plan (batch)]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Ch. 13 Meeting of Creditors Not Held]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Meeting of Creditors Reset - Ch. 13]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Employer Deduction Order]
    Date Published:August 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Employer Deduction Order]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [03-Payment of Chapter 13 Installment Fee]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [04-Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Granting Application to Pay Filing Fees]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [02g-Order Granting Application (Paid in Installments)]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:July 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [02-Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 13) and Confirmation Hearing]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Autodocket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [01 - Chapter 13 Plan - Initial Plan]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [02-Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition, All Schedules and Statements (Fee)-case upload]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Credit Counseling Service Certificate]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Statement of SSN/ITIN (B121) (**Do NOT select this event with other events**)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ganb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1166898
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =