open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia
    Case Number:19-69382-pmb
    Party Name:Adrienne Jean Bunkley
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice to Debtor Re: Financial Mgmt. Cert.]
    Date Published:March 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Notice to Debtor Regarding Financial Management Certificate Due]
    Date Published:March 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:February 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Notice to Debtor Re: Domestic Support Obligations]
    Date Published:February 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Confirmation of Ch. 13 Plan - New Plan Form (12/1/17 or after)]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [P-Declaration of Debtor]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [P-Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [P-Schedule I]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Withdrawal of Claim]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Filing Fee Deficiency]
    Date Published:January 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Autodocket of Installment Receipt - Intake]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Granting Application to Pay Filing Fees]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Employer Deduction Order]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Employer Deduction Order]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Certificate of Manner of Service Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7004]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [02g-Order Granting Application (Paid in Installments)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [02-Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 13) and Confirmation Hearing]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Autodocket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Autodocket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [02-Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [02-Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [01 - Chapter 13 Plan - Initial Plan]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Statement of SSN/ITIN (B121) (**Do NOT select this event with other events**)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Credit Counseling Service Certificate]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [01 - Chapter 13 Plan - Initial Plan]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement of SSN/ITIN (B121) (**Do NOT select this event with other events**)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Credit Counseling Service Certificate]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davey, Melissa J. [Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ganb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1179007
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =