open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia
    Case Number:20-68833-pmb
    Party Name:Joseph Lejuan Muhammad
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, John [Order re: request for 521 dismissal]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, John [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
    Date Published:September 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, John [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:September 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, John [01-Payment of Chapter 7 Installment Fee]
    Date Published:September 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, John [P-Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, John [P-Statement of Intention]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, John [P-Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, John [P-Schedule J]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, John [P-Schedule I]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, John [P-Schedule H]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, John [P-Schedule G]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, John [P-Schedule E/F]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, John [P-Schedule D]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, John [P-Schedule C]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, John [P-Schedule A/B]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, John [P-Chapter 7 Statement of Monthly Income/Means Test Document(s) - (Forms 122A-1, 122A-1Supp, 122A-2)]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, John [P-Attorney Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, John [Autodocket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, John [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Granting Application to Pay Filing Fees In Installments (532)]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, John [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, John [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Deadlines to Correct New Case Deficiency - Individual]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, John [03g-Order Granting Application to Pay in Installments (10-day)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, John [Order Setting Deadlines for Debtor to Correct Filing Deficiencies (Individual)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lewis, John [03-Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7 - Individual - No Asset)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [02-Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of SSN/ITIN (B121) (**Do NOT select this event with other events**)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Credit Counseling Service Certificate]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ganb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1193421
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =