open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Idaho

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Idaho
    Case Number:19-40658-
    Party Name:Ashley M Callos
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Deficiency Notice]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Ch.7/13 Income Tax Turnover Order]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [Income Tax Turnover Order]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [Social Security Statement (SEALED)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 8 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rainsdon, Gary L [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.idb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?161133
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =