Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:17-80044
    Party Name:Billy Eugene Woods and Vickie Lynn Woods
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Clark, Michael D [ADI - Deficiency Financial Management Course (Ch 13)]
    Date Published:April 18, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:17-80044
    Party Name:Billy Eugene Woods and Vickie Lynn Woods
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Clark, Michael D [Address Change - Multiple Addresses (PDF Required)]
    Date Published:April 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:17-80044
    Party Name:Billy Eugene Woods and Vickie Lynn Woods
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Clark, Michael D [Compensation (Text Order - DPS)]
    Date Published:April 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:17-80044
    Party Name:Billy Eugene Woods and Vickie Lynn Woods
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Clark, Michael D [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (Text Order)]
    Date Published:April 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:17-80044
    Party Name:Billy Eugene Woods and Vickie Lynn Woods
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Clark, Michael D [Objection to Amended Plan Notice (30 day Pre-Confirmation ddl)]
    Date Published:March 09, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:17-80044
    Party Name:Billy Eugene Woods and Vickie Lynn Woods
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Clark, Michael D [Confirmation Report (batch)]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:17-80044
    Party Name:Billy Eugene Woods and Vickie Lynn Woods
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Clark, Michael D [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:17-80044
    Party Name:Billy Eugene Woods and Vickie Lynn Woods
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Clark, Michael D [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Attorney Filer - Text Only)]
    Date Published:January 20, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:17-80044
    Party Name:Billy Eugene Woods and Vickie Lynn Woods
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Clark, Michael D [Creditor Request for Notices (Creditor Filer - Text Only)]
    Date Published:January 19, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:17-80044
    Party Name:Billy Eugene Woods and Vickie Lynn Woods
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Clark, Michael D [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:17-80044
    Party Name:Billy Eugene Woods and Vickie Lynn Woods
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Clark, Michael D [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:17-80044
    Party Name:Billy Eugene Woods and Vickie Lynn Woods
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Clark, Michael D [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:17-80044
    Party Name:Billy Eugene Woods and Vickie Lynn Woods
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Clark, Michael D [Amended Plan - Only Use Pre-Confirmation]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:17-80044
    Party Name:Billy Eugene Woods and Vickie Lynn Woods
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Clark, Michael D [Generate Ch 13 341 Notice/Plan and set Obj to Confirmation Ddl]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:17-80044
    Party Name:Billy Eugene Woods and Vickie Lynn Woods
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Clark, Michael D [Requiring Domestic Support Obligation Certification (Required to Obtain a Discharge)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:17-80044
    Party Name:Billy Eugene Woods and Vickie Lynn Woods
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Clark, Michael D [Certification of Credit Counseling (must be obtained BEFORE filing date of petition)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:17-80044
    Party Name:Billy Eugene Woods and Vickie Lynn Woods
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Clark, Michael D [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:17-80044
    Party Name:Billy Eugene Woods and Vickie Lynn Woods
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Clark, Michael D [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:17-80044
    Party Name:Billy Eugene Woods and Vickie Lynn Woods
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Clark, Michael D [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:17-80044
    Party Name:Billy Eugene Woods and Vickie Lynn Woods
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Clark, Michael D [Statement of SSN]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:17-80044
    Party Name:Billy Eugene Woods and Vickie Lynn Woods
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Clark, Michael D [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)Credit Card (SYSTEM USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.ilcb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?135682

Post Your Comment or Question

7 x 3 =