open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of Illinois

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:4:19-cv-04029
    Party Name:McCray v. Scott et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Merit Review Opinion]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Auto docketing digital audio upload]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Merit Review Hearing]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request Counsel]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Writ Issued]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rushville - Sufficient Funds]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Trust Fund Ledger]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Case Opening]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ilcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?75432
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =