open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00322-1
    Party Name:USA v. Cui
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing Held]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Hearing Held]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Set/Reset Hearings - USM In Custody Defendants]
    Date Published:April 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment Held]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Protective Order]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ilnd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?363585
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =