open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of Illinois

ILLINOIS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:4:19-cv-04121
    Party Name:Nash v. Dimas et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:November 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Merit Review Opinion]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Request Counsel]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request Counsel]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Partial Filing Fee Received]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines (including Answer ddl)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rushville - Sufficient Funds]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Trust Fund Ledger]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Case Opening]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ilcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?76866
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =