open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois
    Case Number:19-19055
    Party Name:Jeffone M Mack
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vaughn, Tom [Compensation]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vaughn, Tom [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vaughn, Tom [Personal Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vaughn, Tom [Compensation WITH Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vaughn, Tom [Proof of Service]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vaughn, Tom [Chapter 13 Plan/Amended Plan]
    Date Published:July 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vaughn, Tom [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vaughn, Tom [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ilnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1487628
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =