open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois
    Case Number:19-19544
    Party Name:Kelly J. Ruiz Lara
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Peterson, Ronald R [Reaffirmation Agreement Reviewed - No Further Action]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Peterson, Ronald R [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Peterson, Ronald R [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - no funds]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Peterson, Ronald R [Personal Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Peterson, Ronald R [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Peterson, Ronald R [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Peterson, Ronald R [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7a)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ilnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1488162
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =