open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois
    Case Number:19-19454
    Party Name:Rashard D Barron
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [Dismiss for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [Compensation]
    Date Published:August 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:August 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [Proof of Service]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [Schedules]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [Compensation WITH Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:July 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [Chapter 13 Plan/Amended Plan]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Marshall, Marilyn O [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ilnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1488063
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =