open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois

ILLINOIS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois
    Case Number:19-22775
    Party Name:Marcus A Ramey
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stearns, Glenn B [Personal Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:October 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stearns, Glenn B [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stearns, Glenn B [Compensation WITH Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stearns, Glenn B [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stearns, Glenn B [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stearns, Glenn B [Employer to Pay the Trustee]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stearns, Glenn B [none]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stearns, Glenn B [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ilnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1491725
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =