open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois

ILLINOIS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois
    Case Number:19-22774
    Party Name:Darlene M Cole
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Peterson, Ronald R [Close Bankruptcy Case - Auto]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Peterson, Ronald R [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:November 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Peterson, Ronald R [Request Discharge Order Chapter 7 No Asset - Auto]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Peterson, Ronald R [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - no funds]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Peterson, Ronald R [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Peterson, Ronald R [Request Chapter 7 341 Meeting of Creditors No Asset]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Peterson, Ronald R [none]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Peterson, Ronald R [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ilnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1491724
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =