open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois

ILLINOIS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois
    Case Number:19-22716
    Party Name:Rogelio Velazquez and Adriana Velazquez
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moglia, Alex D [Close Bankruptcy Case - Auto]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moglia, Alex D [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moglia, Alex D [Request Discharge Order Chapter 7 No Asset - Auto]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moglia, Alex D [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moglia, Alex D [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:October 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moglia, Alex D [Certification About a Financial Management Course (Form 423)]
    Date Published:September 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moglia, Alex D [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030)]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moglia, Alex D [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moglia, Alex D [Request Chapter 7 341 Meeting of Creditors No Asset]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Moglia, Alex D [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ilnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1491660
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =