open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois

ILLINOIS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois
    Case Number:19-22768
    Party Name:Danielle R Lambert
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goodman, Karen R [Close Bankruptcy Case - Auto]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goodman, Karen R [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goodman, Karen R [Request Discharge Order]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goodman, Karen R [Reaffirmation Agreement Reviewed - No Further Action]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goodman, Karen R [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goodman, Karen R [Personal Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:August 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goodman, Karen R [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goodman, Karen R [Request Chapter 7 341 Meeting of Creditors No Asset]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goodman, Karen R [none]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goodman, Karen R [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ilnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?1491716
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =