open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois

ILLINOIS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois
    Case Number:1:19-cv-06081
    Party Name:Fountain v. City Of Chicago et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Hearing Held]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [File Excess Pages]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Join]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Join]
    Date Published:November 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:November 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ilnd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?368621
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =