open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois

ILLINOIS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Illinois
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00822-1
    Party Name:USA v. Ortiz-Mondragon
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stay]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:January 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:January 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Release from Custody]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Set/Reset Hearings - USM In Custody Defendants]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Counsel]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance Held]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment Held]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ilnd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?370212
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =