open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Central District of Illinois

ILLINOIS PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Central District of Illinois
    Case Number:4:19-cr-40079-1
    Party Name:USA v. Ruelas
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:June 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
    Date Published:March 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:March 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
    Date Published:March 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:March 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:March 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Bond]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:March 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice Regarding Consent]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT UNREDACTED - Sealed+]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Service Report Addendum + +]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Services Report + +]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Services Recommendation +]
    Date Published:February 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Unsealed]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.ilcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?78561
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =