open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Indiana

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana
    Case Number:2:19-cr-00021-1
    Party Name:USA v. BRITTON
  • Filing Type:Criminal [SCHEDULING Order]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Procedures and Practices]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [PENALTY SHEET]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:November 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
    Date Published:November 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ]
    Date Published:October 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ ]
    Date Published:February 19, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.innd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?60206
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =