Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Indiana
    Case Number:2:19-cr-00051-1
    Party Name:United States of America v. Fuentes et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Notice of IFCD Attorney Designation]
    Date Published:February 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Attorney Appearance for Defendant]
    Date Published:January 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:[SCHEDULING Order]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:[PENALTY SHEET]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Complaint & Affidavit]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Attorney Appearance for USA]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.insd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?90816
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =