open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana
    Case Number:19-90187--13
    Party Name:Corey Allen Brady
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Black, Joseph M. [Judge - Terminate/Add]
    Date Published:May 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Black, Joseph M. [BNC Certificate of Service - Notice re: Personal Financial Management Course Requirement]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Black, Joseph M. [Personal Financial Management Course Requirement Notice]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Black, Joseph M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Black, Joseph M. [Avoid Lien on Household Goods, Order on Motion to]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Black, Joseph M. [341 Meeting Held - Plan Favorable/Unfavorable (TR13F/TR13U)]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Black, Joseph M. [Lien Avoidance on Household Goods Pursuant to Sec. 522(f)(1)(B)(i), Motion for]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Black, Joseph M. [BNC Certificate of Service - 341 Meeting Notice]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Black, Joseph M. [Certificate of Service re: Plan Notice (Ch 13 Only)]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Black, Joseph M. [Plan Notice - Debtor or Trustee Distribution (Ch 13)]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Black, Joseph M. [341 Meeting of Creditors (Ch 13)]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Black, Joseph M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Black, Joseph M. [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Black, Joseph M. [Credit Counseling Certificate]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Black, Joseph M. [Pay Advices and/or Statement in Lieu of Pay Advices]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Black, Joseph M. [Chapter 13 Plan - Original/Corrected Original]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Black, Joseph M. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period (Form 122C-1)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Black, Joseph M. [Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.insb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?705308
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =