Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00617
    Party Name:TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA et al v. OLK et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [MARGINAL ENTRY]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Plan Tendered by]
    Date Published:April 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jurisdictional Statement]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return of Service]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:February 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time (Other)]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [SCHEDULING Order]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Procedures and Practices]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Judge Notice of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.insd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?91825
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =