Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Indiana

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Indiana
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00092
    Party Name:M.G., a minor child, by his parent and legal guardian, S.G. v. Whitley County Consolidated Schools
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:May 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:April 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:April 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:April 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:April 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:April 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Agreed Notice to Extend Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:April 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing/Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice - Other]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.innd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?97864
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =