Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Indiana

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Indiana
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00091
    Party Name:Bowers v. H & H Disposal, LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Preliminary - customized ddls & hrgs]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reset]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing/Deadlines]
    Date Published:April 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated]
    Date Published:April 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Agreed Notice to Extend Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [State Court Complaint]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.innd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?97863
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =