Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Indiana

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Indiana
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00178
    Party Name:Baker v. Redman et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
    Date Published:April 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:March 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Summons]
    Date Published:March 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice - Other]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.innd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?97862
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =