Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana
    Case Number:1:19-cv-01040
    Party Name:WRIGHT v. TILE, INC.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Continuance]
    Date Published:May 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time (Other)]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continuance]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [SCHEDULING Order]
    Date Published:May 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Receipt]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Judge Notice of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear pro hac vice]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.insd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?92907
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =