open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Indiana

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Indiana
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00379
    Party Name:Jelinek v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Setting Social Security Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mag Consent Forms Sent (SSA ONLY) - form will be generated]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security Administrative Record]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued as to USA]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.innd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?98688
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =