open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana
    Case Number:1:19-cv-02343
    Party Name:OSTRAM v. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Continuance]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continuance]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:August 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time (Other)]
    Date Published:July 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [SCHEDULING Order]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:July 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Parties First Extension of Time]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Waiver of Service Executed]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Judge Notice of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.insd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?95617
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =