open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00939
    Party Name:HARRIET v. SAUL
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion (Unopposed)]
    Date Published:July 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Closed Judgment]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.insd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?92643
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =