open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Indiana

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Indiana
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00309
    Party Name:Grange Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. Zahner et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:July 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Summons]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.innd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?99437
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =