open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Indiana

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Indiana
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00308
    Party Name:Miller v. Queen Nails of Fort Wayne, LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Preliminary - customized ddls & hrgs]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Hearing/Deadlines]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [State Court Complaint]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Agreed Notice to Extend Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.innd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?99436
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =