open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana
    Case Number:3:19-cv-00138
    Party Name:BEIRMAN v. SAUL
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript SSA]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consent to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Parties First Extension of Time]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Receipt]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Judge Notice of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.insd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?96672
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =