open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana
    Case Number:1:19-cv-02874
    Party Name:BEUSHAUSEN v. CAVALRY PORTFOLIO SERVICES, LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Closed Dismissed]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Judge Notice of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.insd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?96671
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =