open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana
    Case Number:1:19-cv-02873
    Party Name:GARRETT v. GLA COLLECTION COMPANY, INC.
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time (Other)]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [SCHEDULING Order]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return of Service]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Magistrate Judge Notice of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.insd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?96670
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =