Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa
    Case Number:19-00498-als7
    Party Name:Lee Ho Antoinette
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neiman, Donald F [Ruling on Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neiman, Donald F [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:April 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neiman, Donald F [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (Module)]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neiman, Donald F [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:March 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neiman, Donald F [Debtor's Financial Management Course Certificate and/or Official Form 423]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neiman, Donald F [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neiman, Donald F [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neiman, Donald F [Order RE: Duties of Debtors - Chp 7]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neiman, Donald F [341 Meeting - Ch7 -No Asset-Ind]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neiman, Donald F [Declaration Re: No Employee Income Record]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Declaration Re: No Employee Income Record]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neiman, Donald F [none]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [none]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neiman, Donald F [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neiman, Donald F [Chapter 7 Statement of Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption from Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Neiman, Donald F [Debtor Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statement of Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption from Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Debtor Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.iasb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?146922
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =