open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Kansas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Kansas
    Case Number:19-10188
    Party Name:Patsy A Waggoner
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [Final Decree]
    Date Published:May 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:May 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [Reaffirmation Reviewed]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [Trustee's Initial Report]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [Reaffirmation Agreement]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [DeBN Request Form]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [AAutoAsignJudge7]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [Order]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Order]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Williamson, Darcy D [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card )]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ksb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?253808
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =