Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Kansas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Kansas
    Case Number:19-20476
    Party Name:Robert Glenn Flaherty and Amy Lee Flaherty
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Continue Hearing]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection Deadline]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Amended Schedules]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:April 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
    Date Published:April 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [DeBN Request Form]
    Date Published:April 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:April 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Trustee's Interim Report]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:March 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Support Document]
    Date Published:March 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Wages (Debtor)]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [AAutoAsignJudge13]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [DeBN Request Form]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13, Credit Card )]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ksb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?254376
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =