Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Kansas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Kansas
    Case Number:19-20478
    Party Name:Sherry Ann Mitchell
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Courtroom Minute Entry (Auto Confirm)]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Receipt of Installment Payment (Final)]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Response]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:April 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
    Date Published:April 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Trustee's Interim Report]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Wages (Employer)]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [AAutoAsignJudge13]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [DeBN Request Form]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Griffin, William H [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13, Credit Card )]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ksb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?254379
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =