open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas
    Case Number:2:19-cv-02238
    Party Name:Kaw Drive, LLC v. Secura Insurance
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:August 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Setting Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Judge Assignment]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint (attorney)]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ksd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?126658
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =