open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Kansas

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Kansas
    Case Number:19-11088
    Party Name:Lacy Marion Dunbar
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Rule 5009 Financial Management Notice]
    Date Published:September 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continue Hearing]
    Date Published:September 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:June 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:June 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:June 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Wages (Employer)]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [AAutoAsignJudge13]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [DeBN Request Form]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBR 1007.1(a)(2)(D))]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Davis, Carl B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13, Credit Card )]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ksb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?256325
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =